Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MacGregor, Alistair | NDP | Cowichan—Malahat—Langford | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Malcolmson, Sheila | NDP | Nanaimo—Ladysmith | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Wednesday, January 2, 2019 |
Manly, Paul | Green Party | Nanaimo—Ladysmith | British Columbia | Monday, May 6, 2019 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
May, Elizabeth | Green Party | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
McKinnon, Ron | Liberal | Coquitlam—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
McLeod, Cathy | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Murray, Hon. Joyce | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.