Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raitt, Hon. Lisa | Conservative | Milton | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rayes, Alain | Conservative | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Reid, Scott | Conservative | Lanark—Frontenac—Kingston | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rempel, Hon. Michelle | Conservative | Calgary Nose Hill | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Richards, Blake | Conservative | Banff—Airdrie | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ritz, Hon. Gerry | Conservative | Battlefords—Lloydminster | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Monday, October 2, 2017 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.