Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barlow, John | Conservative | Foothills | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Barrett, Michael | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville—Thousand Islands and Rideau Lakes | Ontario | Monday, December 3, 2018 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Benzen, Bob | Conservative | Calgary Heritage | Alberta | Monday, April 3, 2017 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Bergen, Hon. Candice | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Berthold, Luc | Conservative | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake—Eastman | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Blaney, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Bellechasse—Les Etchemins—Lévis | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Block, Kelly | Conservative | Carlton Trail—Eagle Creek | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Boucher, Sylvie | Conservative | Beauport—Côte-de-Beaupré—Île d'Orléans—Charlevoix | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Brassard, John | Conservative | Barrie—Innisfil | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville—Thousand Islands and Rideau Lakes | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Wednesday, May 2, 2018 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.