Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hajdu, Hon. Patty | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Hardie, Ken | Liberal | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Harvey, T.J. | Liberal | Tobique—Mactaquac | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Hébert, Richard | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, October 23, 2017 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Hehr, Hon. Kent | Liberal | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Hogg, Gordie | Liberal | South Surrey—White Rock | British Columbia | Monday, December 11, 2017 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Holland, Hon. Mark | Liberal | Ajax | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Housefather, Anthony | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Hussen, Hon. Ahmed | Liberal | York South—Weston | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Hutchings, Gudie | Liberal | Long Range Mountains | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.