Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rae, Hon. Bob | Liberal | Toronto Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, July 31, 2013 |
Rafferty, John | NDP | Thunder Bay—Rainy River | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Raitt, Hon. Lisa | Conservative | Halton | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Reid, Scott | Conservative | Lanark—Frontenac—Lennox and Addington | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rickford, Hon. Greg | Conservative | Kenora | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.