Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raitt, Hon. Lisa | Conservative | Halton | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rajotte, James | Conservative | Edmonton—Leduc | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Reid, Scott | Conservative | Lanark—Frontenac—Lennox and Addington | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rempel, Hon. Michelle | Conservative | Calgary Centre-North | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Richards, Blake | Conservative | Wild Rose | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Richardson, Lee | Conservative | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, June 6, 2012 |
Rickford, Hon. Greg | Conservative | Kenora | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Ritz, Hon. Gerry | Conservative | Battlefords—Lloydminster | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.