Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 17 of 17
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baird, Hon. John | Conservative | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Monday, March 16, 2015 |
Barlow, John | Conservative | Macleod | Alberta | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bateman, Joyce | Conservative | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Benoit, Leon | Conservative | Vegreville—Wainwright | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bergen, Hon. Candice | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bernier, Hon. Maxime | Conservative | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Blaney, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Lévis—Bellechasse | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Block, Kelly | Conservative | Saskatoon—Rosetown—Biggar | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Boughen, Ray | Conservative | Palliser | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Braid, Peter | Conservative | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Breitkreuz, Garry | Conservative | Yorkton—Melville | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brown, Lois | Conservative | Newmarket—Aurora | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brown, Patrick | Conservative | Barrie | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Thursday, May 14, 2015 |
Bruinooge, Rod | Conservative | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Butt, Brad | Conservative | Mississauga—Streetsville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.