Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garrison, Randall | NDP | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Genest-Jourdain, Jonathan | NDP | Manicouagan | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Genest, Réjean | NDP | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Giguère, Alain | NDP | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Godin, Yvon | NDP | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gravelle, Claude | NDP | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Groguhé, Sadia | NDP | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.