Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin, Hon. Keith | Liberal | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Mayes, Colin | Conservative | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
McLeod, Cathy | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Moore, Hon. James | Conservative | Port Moody—Westwood—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Murray, Joyce | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.