Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin, Hon. Keith | Liberal | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Mayes, Colin | Conservative | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Moore, Hon. James | Conservative | Port Moody—Westwood—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Murray, Joyce | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, March 17, 2008 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.