Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Batters, Dave | Conservative | Palliser | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Benoit, Leon | Conservative | Vegreville—Wainwright | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Breitkreuz, Garry | Conservative | Yorkton—Melville | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.