Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 31 of 31
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
MacKay, Hon. Peter Gordon | Conservative | Central Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
MacKenzie, Dave | Conservative | Oxford | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Maguire, Larry | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mai, Hoang | NDP | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Marston, Wayne | NDP | Hamilton East—Stoney Creek | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Masse, Brian | NDP | Windsor West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mathyssen, Irene | NDP | London—Fanshawe | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
May, Elizabeth | Green Party | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mayes, Colin | Conservative | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McCallum, Hon. John | Liberal | Markham—Unionville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McColeman, Phil | Conservative | Brant | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McGuinty, David J. | Liberal | Ottawa South | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McKay, Hon. John | Liberal | Scarborough—Guildwood | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McLeod, Cathy | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Menegakis, Costas | Conservative | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Menzies, Hon. Ted | Conservative | Macleod | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Saturday, November 9, 2013 |
Merrifield, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, September 17, 2014 |
Michaud, Élaine | NDP | Portneuf—Jacques-Cartier | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Miller, Larry | Conservative | Bruce—Grey—Owen Sound | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Moore, Christine | NDP | Abitibi—Témiscamingue | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Moore, Hon. James | Conservative | Port Moody—Westwood—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Moore, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Dany | NDP | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Isabelle | NDP | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Marc-André | NDP | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Marie-Claude | NDP | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mourani, Maria | Independent | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mulcair, Hon. Thomas J. | NDP | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Murray, Joyce | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.