Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wagantall, Cathay | Conservative | Yorkton—Melville | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Warawa, Mark | Conservative | Langley—Aldergrove | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Thursday, June 20, 2019 |
Warkentin, Chris | Conservative | Grande Prairie—Mackenzie | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Watts, Dianne L. | Conservative | South Surrey—White Rock | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Friday, September 29, 2017 |
Waugh, Kevin | Conservative | Saskatoon—Grasswood | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Webber, Len | Conservative | Calgary Confederation | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Wong, Hon. Alice | Conservative | Richmond Centre | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.