Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 16 of 16
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sahota, Ruby | Liberal | Brampton North | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Saini, Raj | Liberal | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sangha, Ramesh | Liberal | Brampton Centre | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Saroya, Bob | Conservative | Markham—Unionville | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Schmale, Jamie | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Schulte, Deb | Liberal | King—Vaughan | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Serré, Marc G. | Liberal | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sgro, Hon. Judy A. | Liberal | Humber River—Black Creek | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sheehan, Terry | Liberal | Sault Ste. Marie | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Shipley, Bev | Conservative | Lambton—Kent—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sidhu, Sonia | Liberal | Brampton South | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sikand, Gagan | Liberal | Mississauga—Streetsville | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sorbara, Francesco | Liberal | Vaughan—Woodbridge | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Spengemann, Sven | Liberal | Mississauga—Lakeshore | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Stanton, Bruce | Conservative | Simcoe North | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sweet, David | Conservative | Flamborough—Glanbrook | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.