Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Warawa, Mark | Conservative | Langley—Aldergrove | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Thursday, June 20, 2019 |
Watts, Dianne L. | Conservative | South Surrey—White Rock | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Friday, September 29, 2017 |
Wilkinson, Hon. Jonathan | Liberal | North Vancouver | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Wilson-Raybould, Hon. Jody | Independent | Vancouver Granville | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Wong, Hon. Alice | Conservative | Richmond Centre | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.