Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tassi, Hon. Filomena | Liberal | Hamilton West—Ancaster—Dundas | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Thomas, Rachael | Conservative | Lethbridge | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Trudel, Karine | NDP | Jonquière | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.