Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carr, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Casey, Bill | Liberal | Cumberland—Colchester | Nova Scotia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Casey, Sean | Liberal | Charlottetown | Prince Edward Island | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Champagne, Hon. François-Philippe | Liberal | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Chan, Arnold | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Thursday, September 14, 2017 |
Chen, Shaun | Liberal | Scarborough North | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Cormier, Serge | Liberal | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.