Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 21 of 21
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel, Joe | Conservative | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Davidson, Patricia | Conservative | Sarnia—Lambton | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Davies, Don | NDP | Vancouver Kingsway | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Davies, Libby | NDP | Vancouver East | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Day, Anne-Marie | NDP | Charlesbourg—Haute-Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dechert, Bob | Conservative | Mississauga—Erindale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Del Mastro, Dean | Conservative Independent | Peterborough | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, November 5, 2014 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dewar, Paul | NDP | Ottawa Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dionne Labelle, Pierre | NDP | Rivière-du-Nord | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Donnelly, Fin | NDP | New Westminster—Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Doré Lefebvre, Rosane | NDP | Alfred-Pellan | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dreeshen, Earl | Conservative | Red Deer | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dubé, Matthew | NDP | Chambly—Borduas | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dubourg, Emmanuel | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Duncan, Hon. John | Conservative | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Duncan, Hon. Kirsty | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Duncan, Linda | NDP | Edmonton—Strathcona | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dusseault, Pierre-Luc | NDP | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dykstra, Rick | Conservative | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.