Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 14 of 14
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saxton, Andrew | Conservative | North Vancouver | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Scheer, Andrew | Conservative | Regina—Qu'Appelle | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Schellenberger, Gary Ralph | Conservative | Perth—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Seeback, Kyle | Conservative | Brampton West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Shea, Hon. Gail | Conservative | Egmont | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Shipley, Bev | Conservative | Lambton—Kent—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Shory, Devinder | Conservative | Calgary Northeast | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Smith, Joy | Conservative | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sopuck, Robert | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sorenson, Hon. Kevin | Conservative | Crowfoot | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Stanton, Bruce | Conservative | Simcoe North | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Storseth, Brian | Conservative | Westlock—St. Paul | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Strahl, Mark | Conservative | Chilliwack—Fraser Canyon | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sweet, David | Conservative | Ancaster—Dundas—Flamborough—Westdale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.