Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Findlay, Hon. Kerry-Lynne D. | Conservative | Delta—Richmond East | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Grewal, Nina | Conservative | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McLeod, Cathy | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Wong, Hon. Alice | Conservative | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Young, Wai | Conservative | Vancouver South | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.