Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caron, Guy | NDP | Rimouski-Neigette—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cash, Andrew | NDP | Davenport | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chicoine, Sylvain | NDP | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chisholm, Robert | NDP | Dartmouth—Cole Harbour | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Choquette, François | NDP | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cleary, Ryan | NDP | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—Tecumseh | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Côté, Raymond | NDP | Beauport—Limoilou | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Crowder, Jean | NDP | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cullen, Nathan | NDP | Skeena—Bulkley Valley | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.