Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wallace, Mike | Conservative | Burlington | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Watson, Jeff | Conservative | Essex | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Wilfert, Hon. Bryon | Liberal | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Woodworth, Stephen | Conservative | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Wrzesnewskyj, Borys | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.