Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cadman, Dona | Conservative | Surrey North | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Calandra, Paul | Conservative | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Calkins, Blaine | Conservative | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cannan, Hon. Ron | Conservative | Kelowna—Lake Country | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cannon, Hon. Lawrence | Conservative | Pontiac | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Casson, Hon. Rick | Conservative | Lethbridge | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Clarke, Rob | Conservative | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Conservative | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cummins, John | Conservative | Delta—Richmond East | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.