Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Chamberlain, Hon. Brenda | Liberal | Guelph | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, April 7, 2008 |
Chan, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cullen, Hon. Roy | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.