Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Carr, Gary | Liberal | Halton | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Carroll, Hon. Aileen | Liberal | Barrie | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Catterall, Marlene | Liberal | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Chamberlain, Hon. Brenda | Liberal | Guelph | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Chan, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Comuzzi, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Cullen, Hon. Roy | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.