Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lambropoulos, Emmanuella | Liberal | Saint-Laurent | Quebec | Monday, April 3, 2017 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Lapointe, Linda | Liberal | Rivière-des-Mille-Îles | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Laverdière, Hélène | NDP | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Lebouthillier, Hon. Diane | Liberal | Gaspésie—Les Îles-de-la-Madeleine | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Leitch, Hon. K. Kellie | Conservative | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Lockhart, Alaina | Liberal | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ludwig, Karen | Liberal | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.