Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saroya, Bob | Conservative | Markham—Unionville | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Schmale, Jamie | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Shipley, Bev | Conservative | Lambton—Kent—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Stanton, Bruce | Conservative | Simcoe North | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Sweet, David | Conservative | Flamborough—Glanbrook | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.