Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barsalou-Duval, Xavier | Bloc Québécois | Pierre-Boucher—Les Patriotes—Verchères | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Beaulieu, Mario | Bloc Québécois | La Pointe-de-l'Île | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Boudrias, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.