Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vandal, Dan | Liberal | Saint Boniface—Saint Vital | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Vandenbeld, Anita | Liberal | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Vaughan, Adam | Liberal | Spadina—Fort York | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Virani, Arif | Liberal | Parkdale—High Park | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.