Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tabbara, Marwan | Liberal | Kitchener South—Hespeler | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Tan, Geng | Liberal | Don Valley North | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Tassi, Hon. Filomena | Liberal | Hamilton West—Ancaster—Dundas | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Trudeau, Right Hon. Justin | Liberal | Papineau | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.