Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ratansi, Yasmin | Liberal | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Regan, Hon. Geoff | Liberal | Halifax West | Nova Scotia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rioux, Jean R. | Liberal | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Robillard, Yves | Liberal | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rodriguez, Hon. Pablo | Liberal | Honoré-Mercier | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rogers, Churence | Liberal | Bonavista—Burin—Trinity | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, December 11, 2017 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Romanado, Sherry | Liberal | Longueuil—Charles-LeMoyne | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rota, Anthony | Liberal | Nipissing—Timiskaming | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rudd, Kim | Liberal | Northumberland—Peterborough South | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ruimy, Dan | Liberal | Pitt Meadows—Maple Ridge | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rusnak, Don | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Rainy River | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.