Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garneau, Hon. Marc | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Westmount | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Gerretsen, Mark | Liberal | Kingston and the Islands | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Goldsmith-Jones, Pamela | Liberal | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast—Sea to Sky Country | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Goodale, Hon. Ralph | Liberal | Regina—Wascana | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Gould, Hon. Karina | Liberal | Burlington | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Graham, David de Burgh | Liberal | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.