Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aldag, John | Liberal | Cloverdale—Langley City | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Alghabra, Omar | Liberal | Mississauga Centre | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Amos, William | Liberal | Pontiac | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Anandasangaree, Gary | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge Park | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Arseneault, René | Liberal | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Arya, Chandra | Liberal | Nepean | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ayoub, Ramez | Liberal | Thérèse-De Blainville | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.