Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garneau, Hon. Marc | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Genest-Jourdain, Jonathan | NDP | Manicouagan | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Genest, Réjean | NDP | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Giguère, Alain | NDP | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gourde, Jacques | Conservative | Lotbinière—Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Groguhé, Sadia | NDP | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.