Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 12 of 12
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bellavance, André | Independent | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Benskin, Tyrone | NDP | Jeanne-Le Ber | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bernier, Hon. Maxime | Conservative | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Blanchette-Lamothe, Lysane | NDP | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Blanchette, Denis | NDP | Louis-Hébert | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Blaney, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Lévis—Bellechasse | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Boivin, Françoise | NDP | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Borg, Charmaine | NDP | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Boulerice, Alexandre | NDP | Rosemont—La Petite-Patrie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Boutin-Sweet, Marjolaine | NDP | Hochelaga | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brahmi, Tarik | NDP | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brosseau, Ruth Ellen | NDP | Berthier—Maskinongé | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.