Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thibeault, Glenn | Independent | Sudbury | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Monday, January 5, 2015 |
Tilson, David | Conservative | Dufferin—Caledon | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Trottier, Bernard | Conservative | Etobicoke—Lakeshore | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Truppe, Susan | Conservative | London North Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.