Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MacKenzie, Dave | Conservative | Oxford | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Marston, Wayne | NDP | Hamilton East—Stoney Creek | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Masse, Brian | NDP | Windsor West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mathyssen, Irene | NDP | London—Fanshawe | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McCallum, Hon. John | Liberal | Markham—Unionville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McColeman, Phil | Conservative | Brant | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McGuinty, David J. | Liberal | Ottawa South | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McKay, Hon. John | Liberal | Scarborough—Guildwood | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Menegakis, Costas | Conservative | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Miller, Larry | Conservative | Bruce—Grey—Owen Sound | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.