Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Layton, Hon. Jack | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Monday, August 22, 2011 |
Leitch, Hon. K. Kellie | Conservative | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lemieux, Pierre | Conservative | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Leung, Chungsen | Conservative | Willowdale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lizon, Wladyslaw | Conservative | Mississauga East—Cooksville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lobb, Ben | Conservative | Huron—Bruce | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.