Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fantino, Hon. Julian | Conservative | Vaughan | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Flaherty, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Whitby—Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Thursday, April 10, 2014 |
Freeland, Hon. Chrystia | Liberal | Toronto Centre | Ontario | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.