Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baird, Hon. John | Conservative | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Monday, March 16, 2015 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Braid, Peter | Conservative | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brown, Lois | Conservative | Newmarket—Aurora | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brown, Patrick | Conservative | Barrie | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Thursday, May 14, 2015 |
Butt, Brad | Conservative | Mississauga—Streetsville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.