Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Warawa, Mark | Conservative | Langley | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Weston, John | Conservative | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast—Sea to Sky Country | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Wilks, David | Conservative | Kootenay—Columbia | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Wong, Hon. Alice | Conservative | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.