Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Savoie, Denise | NDP | Victoria | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Friday, August 31, 2012 |
Sellah, Djaouida | NDP | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sgro, Hon. Judy A. | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Shea, Hon. Gail | Conservative | Egmont | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sims, Jinny Jogindera | NDP | Newton—North Delta | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sitsabaiesan, Rathika | NDP | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Smith, Joy | Conservative | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
St-Denis, Lise | Liberal | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.