Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Findlay, Hon. Kerry-Lynne D. | Conservative | Delta—Richmond East | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Foote, Hon. Judy | Liberal | Random—Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Freeland, Hon. Chrystia | Liberal | Toronto Centre | Ontario | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Freeman, Mylène | NDP | Argenteuil—Papineau—Mirabel | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.