Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
Crockatt, Joan | Conservative | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, November 26, 2012 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Crowder, Jean | NDP | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.