Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bateman, Joyce | Conservative | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bergen, Hon. Candice | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Blanchette-Lamothe, Lysane | NDP | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Block, Kelly | Conservative | Saskatoon—Rosetown—Biggar | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Boivin, Françoise | NDP | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Borg, Charmaine | NDP | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Boutin-Sweet, Marjolaine | NDP | Hochelaga | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brosseau, Ruth Ellen | NDP | Berthier—Maskinongé | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brown, Lois | Conservative | Newmarket—Aurora | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.