Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Schellenberger, Gary Ralph | Conservative | Perth—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Seeback, Kyle | Conservative | Brampton West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Shipley, Bev | Conservative | Lambton—Kent—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Stanton, Bruce | Conservative | Simcoe North | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sweet, David | Conservative | Ancaster—Dundas—Flamborough—Westdale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.