Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel, Joe | Conservative | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Davidson, Patricia | Conservative | Sarnia—Lambton | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dechert, Bob | Conservative | Mississauga—Erindale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dykstra, Rick | Conservative | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.