Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 of 1
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maguire, Larry | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.