Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tilson, David | Conservative | Dufferin—Caledon | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Toet, Lawrence | Conservative | Elmwood—Transcona | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Tuesday, July 9, 2013 |
Trost, Brad | Conservative | Saskatoon—Humboldt | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Trottier, Bernard | Conservative | Etobicoke—Lakeshore | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Tweed, Merv | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Saturday, August 31, 2013 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.