Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scarpaleggia, Francis | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sgro, Hon. Judy A. | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Simms, Scott | Liberal | Bonavista—Gander—Grand Falls—Windsor | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
St-Denis, Lise | Liberal | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.